Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03594
Date Filed2022-11-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Studies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning credible fear screenings since 2010. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked CIS to clarify its request. CIS clarified the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9699849) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for Defendant)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
2022-11-30Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmrl) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-303LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/19/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/18/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing receipt)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
2022-12-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/19/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing receipt)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
2022-12-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/19/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Mailing receipt)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
2023-01-177NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/17/2023)
2023-01-178Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/17/2023)
2023-01-18MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 8 consent Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than February 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/18/2023. (lcja) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar