Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2022cv07534
Date Filed2022-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
PlaintiffACLU Foundation of Northern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Northern California submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning template form used by the ICE Office of Detention Oversight and ICE Enforcement and Removal Operations in conducting compliance inspections of immigration detention facilities from January 2018 to the present. The ACLU of Northern California also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Northern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-301COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. § 552 et seq. against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17772456.). Filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation, ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-302Proposed Summons. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-303Certificate of Interested Entities by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation identifying Other Affiliate No Interest to Report for ACLU Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-304NOTICE of Appearance by Indra Neel Chatterjee (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-305NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Jill Low (Low, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-306NOTICE of Appearance by My Khanh Ngo for Plaintiffs (Ngo, My Khanh) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-307Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2022) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-018Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-019Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2022) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-0710NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Schoen for Plaintiffs. (Schoen, Hannah) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-0711CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 12/7/2022) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-1212SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, ACLU Foundation of Northern California. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/2/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Low, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/12/2022) (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2022-12-1313CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-1614MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17830696.) filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Mahfooz, Sidra) (Filed on 12/16/2022) (Entered: 12/16/2022)
2022-12-1615ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2022) (Entered: 12/16/2022)
2022-12-1916STIPULATION Under Civ. L.R. 6-1(a) filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/19/2022) (Entered: 12/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar