Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03602
Date Filed2022-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning certain described text messages and phone bills related to FERC Chairman Richard Glick. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located 12 responsive records and withheld 9 records under Exemption 5 (privileges). IER filed an administrative appeal. FERC denied its administrative appeal and IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-301COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9704945) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-01Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-013ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/1/22. (DM) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-064NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2022-12-235Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
2022-12-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant requests that the Court extend Defendant's deadline to answer from January 3, 2023 to January 25, 2023, relying, essentially, on the substantially increased caseload at the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia. As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED . Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before January 25, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 28, 2022. (lcckk1) (Entered: 12/28/2022)
2022-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/25/2023. (kt) (Entered: 12/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar