Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrown v. U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2022cv04151
Date Filed2022-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lynn N Hughes
PlaintiffSteven A. Brown
Case DescriptionSteven Brown submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning H-4 and H-4 EAD programs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Brown filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-301COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29132947) filed by Steven A. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Brown, Steven) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-302Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit As to US Attorney General, # 2 Exhibit As to USAO)(Brown, Steven) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-013Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-014ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2023-01-095ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, filed.(Siddiqui, Myra) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar