Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRyan, LLC v. U.S. Department of the Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2022cv04160
Date Filed2022-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sim Lake
PlaintiffRyan, LLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Ryan, LLC submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning the examination of the Captive Insurance Program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Ryan that it would be unable to respond within the statutory time limits. After some back and forth without success, Ryan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-11-301COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29136575) filed by Ryan, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-11-302Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation Request for Issuance of Summons, # 2 Continuation Request for Issuance of Summons)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-013ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-014Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-095CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2022)
2022-12-136NOTICE of Appearance by Nishant Kumar on behalf of U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-137MOTION for Nishant Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2023. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-138ORDER - Granting 7 Motion for Nishant Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Department of the Treasury Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found here . (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-149CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed.(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/14/2022)
2022-12-1910Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time respond to Complaint by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/19/2022)
2022-12-1911ORDER - Granting 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time respond to Complaint ; Answer due for U.S. Department of the Treasury 1/17/2023. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 12/19/2022)
2023-01-1312ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed.(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 01/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar