Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSILVERSMITH v. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03613
Date Filed2022-12-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffJOLYON A. SILVERSMITH "Jol"
Case DescriptionJolyon Silversmith, an attorney at KMA Zuckert LLC, submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Aviation Administration for records concerning communications between Elliott Black, who was the FAA's Director of Airport Policy, and the Town of East Hampton, NY, related to other airports that supposedly transitioned from public-use to private-use. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Silversmith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-011COMPLAINT against JOLYON A SILVERSMITH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9705316) filed by JOLYON A SILVERSMITH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-76, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons FAA Summons, # 4 Summons USAG Summons, # 5 Summons USAO Summons)(Silversmith, Jolyon) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-012NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JOLYON A SILVERSMITH. Case related to Case No. D.C.Cir. 22-1136. (Silversmith, Jolyon) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-013NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JOLYON A SILVERSMITH. Case related to Case No. D.D.C. 22-3076. (Silversmith, Jolyon) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-01NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to jsilversmith@kmazuckert.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (Briggs, Charles) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-014ERRATA Complaint Corrected Per LCvR 5.1(c) by JOLYON A SILVERSMITH re 1 Complaint,. (Silversmith, Jolyon) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-01Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zcb) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-015SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION served on 12/5/2022 (Silversmith, Jolyon) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/05/2022. (Silversmith, Jolyon) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-138RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/5/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/4/2023. (Silversmith, Jolyon) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2023-01-039NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-0310ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Parties to confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions by January 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 4, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-1811Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-1812SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for scheduling order and information concerning case procedures. The Parties are ORDERED to submit their next Joint Status Report by March 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 18, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar