Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGYPOLICY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03629
Date Filed2022-12-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Science and Technology Policy for records concerning communications between any agency employees and a list of individuals and entities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked PPT to narrow the scope of its request. PPT responded by providing a more specific set of entities and employees. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGYPOLICY
DefendantOFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-021COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGYPOLICY "OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY"" ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9710521) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 22-061, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - OSTP GC)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 12/02/2022)
2022-12-05Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zljn) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
2022-12-052SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
2022-12-063STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 6, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2023-01-044NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Coogle on behalf of OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY (Coogle, Christine) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-045ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY.(Coogle, Christine) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-10MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 23, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated dates for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's request can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 10, 2023. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
2023-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2023. (zcam) (Entered: 01/11/2023)
2023-01-236Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY POLICY. (Coogle, Christine) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar