Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-05 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons USCIS, # 8 Summons AG, # 9 Summons USAO, # 10 Summons DHS General Counsel)(Alrabe, Khaled) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2022-12-05 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2022-12-05 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2022-12-05 | 3 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/5/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/05/2022) |
2023-01-12 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-01-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before February 16, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference to be held via Zoom on February 23, 2023, at 12:15 p.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/13/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-02-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the initial scheduling conference currently scheduled for February 23, 2023, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for February 24, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., to be held via video. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/10/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-16 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 28, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for February 24, 2023, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/16/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-03-28 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/28/2023) |
2023-04-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 6 , the parties are ORDERED to appear for a status conference, to be held via Zoom, on April 13, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/4/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-05 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Qureshi on behalf of NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD (Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 04/05/2023) |
2023-04-13 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 4/13/2023 via zoom. Joint Status Report due on or before 5/19/2023) (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (zglw) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/19/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-06-28 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/28/2023) |
2023-06-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/28/2023. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 06/28/2023) |
2023-08-03 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-08-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-09-21 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2023) |
2023-09-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/21/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/21/2023) |
2023-11-01 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2023-11-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/1/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2023-12-13 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2023) |
2023-12-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/14/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/14/2023) |
2024-02-02 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/02/2024) |
2024-02-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall file a premotion statement or the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/2/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/02/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |