Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03634
Date Filed2022-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffNATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD
Case DescriptionThe National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the number of adjustments of status application denials made under Section 212(a)(3)(B) of the Immigration and Nationality Act. NIP also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted NIP's request for a fee waiver. NIP also submitted a FOIA request for records from the State Department for the number of visa applications for named countries in Africa and the Middle East. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from either agency, NIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants Department of State and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9712313) filed by NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons USCIS, # 7 Summons AG, # 8 Summons USAO, # 9 Summons General Counsel DHS, # 10 Summons Department of State)(Alrabe, Khaled) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
2022-12-05Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
2022-12-062SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2022-12-153NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Qureshi on behalf of NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD (Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 12/15/2022)
2023-01-124ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/12/2023)
2023-01-13MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than February 27, 2023. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/13/2023. (lcja) (Entered: 01/13/2023)
2023-01-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2023. (tb) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar