Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03649
Date Filed2022-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning certain specified text messages between FERC Commissioner Allison Clements using either "funder" or "SustainableFERC." The agency did not acknowledge receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-061COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9716857) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to AG, US Attorney, and Defendant, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2022-12-072NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-07Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-074STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 7, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-305NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/30/2022)
2022-12-306Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/30/2022)
2022-12-30MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before January 27, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 30, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar