Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03650
Date Filed2022-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning a series of chat/log meetings that had been hosted by FERC. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. IER also submitted another FOIA request for text messages from Chairman Richard Glick. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request as well. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-061COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9716878) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2022-12-072NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-07Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-234NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
2022-12-235MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
2022-12-236Memorandum in opposition to re 5 Motion for Extension of Time to , RESPONSE re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
2022-12-277REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-28MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the 5 motion and plaintiff's position, it is ORDERED that the defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 6, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/28/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar