Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9716890) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to AG, US Attorney, and Defendant, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2022-12-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 3 | STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 14, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2023-01-06 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-06 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-06 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 6, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 24, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 27, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-02-24 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 20, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 27, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-04-20 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/20/2023) |
2023-04-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 1, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 21, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-06-01 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 7, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 1, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 12 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Moustakas on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY Substituting for attorney Derek Hammond (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 7, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 10, 2023. (lcdlf1) Modified 7/11/2023 to add "minute order"(zjch, ). (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-09-07 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2023) |
2023-09-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before October 6, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 8, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-09-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/6/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 09/08/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Status Report, the parties shall file a status report on or before December 5, 2023, if this action has not been dismissed by such date. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 10, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/5/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 16 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-10-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Stipulation of Dismissal, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 23, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |