Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTWIN-CITY MOTOR COMPANY BUILDING, LLC v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03652
Date Filed2022-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffTWIN-CITY MOTOR COMPANY BUILDING, LLC
Case DescriptionThe Twin City Motor Company Building submitted FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning the Examination Division's administrative files related to the Kanter Appraisal Reports. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Twin City Motor Company Building filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-061COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9716936) filed by TWIN-CITY MOTOR COMPANY BUILDING, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B)(Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 12/06/2022)
2022-12-08Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-123STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 12, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2022-12-204AFFIDAVIT of Mailing to United States Attorney General (Patel, Vivek) Modified on 1/4/2023 to correct event (zjm). (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-205ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/12/2022. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 1/2/2023. (Patel, Vivek); Modified on 12/20/2022 - Said pleading was entered in error at the request of counsel (ztth). (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 12/12/2022 (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-207RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2023. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2023-01-048RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/19/2022. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-069MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
2023-01-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 9, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar