Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03653
Date Filed2022-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning certain described correspondence sent to or from named IRS officials that was also sent to or from certain named staff of Congress. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, IER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-071COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9717019) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-072NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-083SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-08Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-144STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 14, 2022. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/14/2022)
2023-01-205Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, nunc pro tunc by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
2023-01-23MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The defendants shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before February 10, 2023. In addition, the public docket reflects that the plaintiff has not yet filed proof of service of the defendants. In accordance with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiff is ORDERED to file proof of service on or before February 5, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 23, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/10/2023. Proof of service due by 2/5/2023. (zjch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-256STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Service Accomplished Dec. 8, 2022 by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-02-127MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 02/12/2023)
2023-02-158RESPONSE re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and the plaintiff's 8 Response, the defendants' 7 Motion is GRANTED. The defendants shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before March 13, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 15, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-159ERRATA re 8 RESPONS (Corrected due to Error) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hardin, Matthew) Modified docket relationship/text on 2/21/2023 (zed). (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-1510NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kartik Narayan Venguswamy (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-03-1311ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 03/13/2023)
2023-03-14MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 14, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar