Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03656
Date Filed2022-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records from the Ethics Office pertaining to a list of agency officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided PPT several estimated times of completion, however, after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9718212) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA F02021-06300, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- Department of State)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-08Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-083STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 8, 2022. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2023-01-054Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/05/2023)
2023-01-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and DIRECTING defendant to respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by February 8, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 6, 2023. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
2023-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 2/8/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-305ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/30/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar