Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT against SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9719278) filed by SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Bergin, Patrick) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-08 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 2 | SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 3 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/8/2022. (lctnm2) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2023-01-03 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-03 | 5 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-03 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall now file its response to the Complaint on or before February 1, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/3/2023. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/1/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-02-01 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the report on or before March 6, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/1/23. (lctnm2) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 02/02/2023) |
2023-03-06 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS. (Bergin, Patrick) (Entered: 03/06/2023) |
2023-03-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: After considering the 7 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report by April 26, 2023. If the parties resolve all issues before then, they shall promptly notify the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/6/2023. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/06/2023) |
2023-03-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 03/06/2023) |
2023-04-26 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/26/2023) |
2023-04-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: After considering the 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report by June 14, 2023. If the parties resolve all issues before then, they shall promptly notify the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/26/2023. (lctnm2) (Entered: 04/26/2023) |
2023-04-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 04/26/2023) |
2023-06-14 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/14/2023) |
2023-06-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: After considering the 9 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report by August 10, 2023. If the parties resolve all issues before then, they shall promptly notify the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/14/2023. (lctnm2) (Entered: 06/14/2023) |
2023-06-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 06/15/2023) |
2023-08-10 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/10/2023) |
2023-08-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: After considering the 10 Joint Status Report, the Court directs the parties to file another JSR by September 27, 2023. If the parties resolve all issue before then, they shall promptly notify the Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/11/2023. (lctnm2) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-09-25 | 11 | STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint 11 Notice of Dismissal, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Court ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/26/2023. (lctnm2) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |