Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-08 | 1 | COMPLAINT (No Process) against Homeland Security, Immigration & Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17797757.). Filed by Prairielands Freedom Fund, National Bail Fund Network, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Norcal Resist Fund, American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - DHS Receipt Notice, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - ICE Email Notice, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Previous Request for Bond Handbook 1, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E - Previous Request for Bond Handbook 2, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F - Previous Request for Bond Handbook 3, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pennington, Alison) (Filed on 12/8/2022) Modified on 12/9/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 2 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17798366.) filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist Fund, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 12/8/2022) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 3 | Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/22/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2022) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 4 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jessica Zhang. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 5 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Claudia Valenzuela ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17800544.) filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist Fund, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Valenzuela, Claudia) (Filed on 12/9/2022) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 6 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 7 | Proposed Summons. (Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 12/9/2022) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 8 | Proposed Summons. (Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 12/9/2022) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 9 | Proposed Summons. (Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 12/9/2022) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 10 | Proposed Summons. (Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 12/9/2022) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 11 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nikhel Sus ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17805129.) filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D.C. Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Sus, Nikhel) (Filed on 12/12/2022) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-12 | | Electronic filing error . A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendant on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: 7 Proposed Summons filed by Prairielands Freedom Fund, National Bail Fund Network, American Immigration Council, Norcal Resist, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, 8 Proposed Summons filed by Prairielands Freedom Fund, National Bail Fund Network, American Immigration Council, Norcal Resist, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, 9 Proposed Summons filed by Prairielands Freedom Fund, National Bail Fund Network, American Immigration Council, Norcal Resist, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, 10 Proposed Summons filed by Prairielands Freedom Fund, National Bail Fund Network, American Immigration Council, Norcal Resist, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2022) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 12 | Proposed Summons. (Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 12/12/2022) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 13 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Raul Pinto ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17807285.) filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 12/12/2022) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 14 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Claudia Valenzuela. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 15 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nikhel Sus. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 16 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Raul A. Pinto. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 17 | Summons Issued as to Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 18 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Yvette Changuin ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17821131.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/14/2022 filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TX Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Changuin, Yvette) (Filed on 12/14/2022) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 19 | ERRONEOUS ENTRY- Disregard Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Yvette Changuin. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022) Modified on 12/15/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 20 | First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Tamara F. Goodlette ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17821746.) filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TX Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodlette, Tamara) (Filed on 12/14/2022) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 21 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Tamara F. Goodlette. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-15 | 22 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Yvette Changuin. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 23 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services.. (Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2023-01-18 | 24 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17906738.) filed by American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Creighton, Emily) (Filed on 1/18/2023) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-01-19 | 25 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Emily Creighton. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 26 | AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of California on 12/27/2022, filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Certified Mail Receipts, # 2 Exhibit USPS Certified Mail Return Receipts)(Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 1/20/2023) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-26 | 27 | NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Rivas-Bernardy (Rivas-Bernardy, Vanessa) (Filed on 1/26/2023) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | 28 | Stipulation to Extend time to Respond to Complaint filed by Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, rairielands Freedom Fund, National Bail Fund Network, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Norcal Resist Fund, American Immigration Council. (DeVito, David) (Filed on 1/26/2023) Modified on 1/27/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 29 | CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms . Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2023. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2023) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-30 | 30 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Manoj Govindaiah ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17941440.) filed by American Immigration Council, National Bail Fund Network, Norcal Resist, Prairielands Freedom Fund, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Govindaiah, Manoj) (Filed on 1/30/2023) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 31 | Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Manoj Govindaiah. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2023) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-02-10 | 32 | Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief by Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (DeVito, David) (Filed on 2/10/2023) Modified on 2/13/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-10 | 33 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.. (DeVito, David) (Filed on 2/10/2023) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 34 | CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-15 | 35 | ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 02/15/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2023) Modified on 2/16/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2023) |
2023-02-16 | 36 | CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 14, 2023, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by March 7th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:22-cv-07772-HSG. The March 14, 2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2023) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 37 | NOTICE of Appearance by Sharanya Mohan (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 2/21/2023) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 38 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 2/21/2023) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 39 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zhang, Jessica) (Filed on 2/21/2023) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-24 | 40 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Immigration & Customs Enforcement, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Prairielands Freedom Fund, National Bail Fund Network, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Norcal Resist Fund, American Immigration Council. (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 2/24/2023) Modified on 2/27/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-27 | 41 | ORDER (as modified) Granting 40 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference .Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2023 and Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2023 02:00 PM. The 5/9 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/27/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |
|