Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMORRISON URENA, L.C. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03697
Date Filed2022-12-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffMORRISON URENA, L.C.
Case DescriptionThe immigration law firm of Morrison Urena, L.C. submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning an intermittent IT glitch in the State Department's Consular Electronic Application system that originated on or about February 20, 2022 and lasted through June 15, 2022. Morrison Urena also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Morrison Urena's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Morrison Urena filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9725563) filed by MORRISON URENA, L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons Department of State, # 4 Summons Merrick Garland, # 5 Summons US Attorney, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/09/2022)
2022-12-12Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsl) (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2022-12-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 12/12/2022)
2023-01-093RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/14/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/27/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/27/2022 (George, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-134NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/13/2023)
2023-01-135ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/13/2023)
2023-01-236ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the government shall file its Vaughn index and supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/23/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar