Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03711
Date Filed2022-12-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionAmerican Center for Law and Justice submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the agency's interactions with social media platforms, including stories about Hunter Biden. The agency acknowledged of the request. The agency invoked a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records because of the inclusion of third-party identifiers. ACLJ filed an administrative appeal of the Glomar response. After hearing nothing further from the agency, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-131COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9730162) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A --- FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B --- Proof of Delivery, # 3 Exhibit C --- Acknowledgement, # 4 Exhibit D --- Determination, # 5 Exhibit E --- Administrative Appeal, # 6 Exhibit F --- Proof of Filing, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons)(Monaghan, John) (Attachment 7 replaced on 12/13/2022) (zljn). (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Monaghan, John) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-13Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zljn) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/13/2022)
2022-12-204NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-205NOTICE of Appearance by John Monaghan on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Monaghan, John) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2023-01-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 1/19/2023 (Monaghan, John) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
2023-01-207RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/19/2023. (Monaghan, John) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
2023-01-208RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/19/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/18/2023. (Monaghan, John) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar