Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. U. S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03765
Date Filed2022-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted a FOIA request for records concerning meetings of the Supply Chain Disruptions Task Force. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU. S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-191COMPLAINT against U. S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9744221) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. FOIA Request from FGI to USDA dated July 12, 2022, # 2 Summons to the Attorney General of the United States, # 3 Summons to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 4 Summons to the U.S. Department of Agriculture, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goeken, Richard) (Entered: 12/19/2022)
2022-12-20Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U. S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-203STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/20/2022. (lctnm2) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar