Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSIEGAL MCINTYRE v. US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03766
Date Filed2022-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffERIN SIEGAL MCINTYRE
Case DescriptionErin Siegel McIntyre, a journalist and photographer who was making a documentary on CBP, submitted 14 FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning hazing and sexual harassment problems at the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after the agency respond substantively to any of the requests, McIntyre filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-201COMPLAINT against US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9744442) filed by ERIN SIEGAL MCINTYRE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to CBP, # 3 Summons Summons to USAO, # 4 Summons Summons to USAG)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-202SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ERIN SIEGAL MCINTYRE re 1 Complaint, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2022-12-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2022-12-224ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/22/22. (DM) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2023-01-235NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-236Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Relying on the heavy workloads at the U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia, counsel for Defendant requests the Court extend Defendant's time to answer from January 27, 2023 to February 27, 2023. As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED . Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before February 27, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 23, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar