Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMORRISON URENA, L.C. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03773
Date Filed2022-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffMORRISON URENA, L.C.
Case DescriptionThe immigration law firm of Morrison Urena submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications between the U.S. Embassy in Islamabad, Pakistan and various agency offices pertaining to staffing shortages. Morrison Urena also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged request of the request and denied the request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Morrison Urena filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9746237) filed by MORRISON URENA, L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Summons US ATTORNEY, # 5 Summons DEPARTMENT OF STATE, # 6 Summons MERRICK GARLAND, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-202NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MORRISON URENA, L.C.. Case related to Case No. 22-cv-3579. (Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-21Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zcb) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2022-12-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2023-01-234NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-235ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-236RESPONSE re 2 Notice of Related Case filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-247REPLY to opposition to motion re 6 Response to Document (Notice of Related Case) filed by MORRISON URENA, L.C.. (Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 01/24/2023)
2023-02-018RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/21/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/30/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/6/2023 (Morrison, Curtis) (Entered: 02/01/2023)
2023-02-239GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 23, 2023. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar