Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNickson v. US Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2022cv04397
Date Filed2022-12-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alfred H Bennett
PlaintiffMatthew Paul Nickson
Case DescriptionMatthew Nickson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records from the U.S. Embassy in Cameroon concerning the treatment of Anglophone deportees/returnees to Cameroon. Nickson also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Nickson's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Nickson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-201COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29224129) filed by Matthew Paul Nickson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nickson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-202Request for Issuance of Summons as to US Department of State, filed.(Nickson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-203CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matthew Paul Nickson, filed.(Nickson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2022)
2022-12-214ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/7/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2022-12-225Summons Issued as to US Department of State. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2023-01-196ANSWER to 1 Complaint by US Department of State, filed.(Siddiqui, Myra) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar