Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGabig et al v. US Department of Justice et al
DistrictNorthern District of Alabama
CityNortheastern
Case Number5:2022cv01595
Date Filed2022-12-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr
PlaintiffJerome S. Gabig
PlaintiffORBIS Sibro Inc
Case DescriptionJerome Gabig, an attorney for ORBIS Sibro, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning accounting records pertaining to ORBIS Sibro submitted to the U.S. Attorney's Office in South Carolina. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the U.S. Attorney's Office in South Carolina, Gabig filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. OIP acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from OIP. Gabig filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Justice
DefendantMerrick Garland in his Official Capacity the US Attorney General
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jerome S. Gabig, ORBIS Sibro Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1A, # 3 Exhibit 1B, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(LCB) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-222NOTICE of assignment of case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (LCB) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-22Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 2889 (LCB) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-223Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, US Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LCB) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2023-01-094SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerome S. Gabig, ORBIS Sibro Inc. Merrick Garland served on 12/27/2022, answer due 2/25/2023. (Steakley, Roderic) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-095SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerome S. Gabig, ORBIS Sibro Inc. US Department of Justice served on 12/30/2022, answer due 2/28/2023. (Steakley, Roderic) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-096Alias Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to United States Attorney's Office. (LCB) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-107Alias Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered to plaintiff for service as to the USAO B-Ham. (LCB) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
2023-01-128SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerome S. Gabig, ORBIS Sibro Inc. USAO served on 1/11/2023, answer due 3/12/2023. (Steakley, Roderic) (Entered: 01/12/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar