Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBLEACH v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03792
Date Filed2022-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffKATHERINE BLEACH
Case DescriptionKatherine Bleach submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's policy for expediting certain projects or new commercial enterprises. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bleach filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9749851) filed by KATHERINE BLEACH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to USCIS, # 3 Summons Summons to Graves, # 4 Summons Summons to Garland)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-22Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zcb) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2023-01-063RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/29/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/30/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/21/2023.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Proof of Service)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
2023-01-194NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-195ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-316INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/31/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar