Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03807
Date Filed2022-12-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffVANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case DescriptionVanda Pharmaceuticals submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning the drug tasimelteon and the manufacture or production of tasimelteon. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Vanda Pharmaceuticals fields suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-221COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9751709) filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2022-12-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2022)
2022-12-27Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zljn) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2023-01-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/30/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/29/2023. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar