Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRifkin & Fox-Isicoff, P.A. v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2022cv24204
Date Filed2022-12-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge K. Michael Moore
PlaintiffRifkin & Fox-Isicoff, P.A.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Ripkin & Fox-Issicoff submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the number of I-924 petitions pending on June 30, 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked the law firm for a clarification. The law firm provide a clarification. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Ripkin & Fox-Iscoff filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-271COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16196720, filed by Rifkin & Fox-Isicoff, P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Exhibit A - 2022-05-11 Letter from USIC, # 4 Exhibit B - 2022-05-19 - E-mail from Silva, # 5 Exhibit C - 2022-05-19 Letter from USCIS)(Isicoff, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-272Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-273Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services/ U.S. Attorney's Office for The Southern District of Florida. (rbe) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-274PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/27/2022. (fpi) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-275PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREN F. LOUIS. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/27/2022. (fpi) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2023-01-096SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Rifkin & Fox-Isicoff, P.A.. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Verified Return of Service, # 2 Exhibit - USPS Receipt on Dept. of Homeland Security, # 3 Exhibit - USPS Receipt on Attorney General, # 4 Exhibit - USPS Receipt on USCIS, # 5 Exhibit - - USPS Receipt on USCIS National Records)(Yannuzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-097Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to hold Scheduling Conference re 4 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Rifkin & Fox-Isicoff, P.A.. Responses due by 1/23/2023 (Yannuzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-098SUPPLEMENT to 7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to hold Scheduling Conference re 4 Pretrial Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Rifkin & Fox-Isicoff, P.A. (Yannuzzi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-109PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference. 7 . Therein, Plaintiff requests an extension of time to hold its joint scheduling conference and to file its joint scheduling report because it calculated Defendant USCIS's response to the Complaint as being due on March 6, 2023 (whereas the parties' joint scheduling report is February 25, 2023). See generally 7 . Yet in a supplement to its Motion, Plaintiff itself notes that, in lawsuits arising under the Freedom of Information Act, USCIS has only 30 (and not the customary 60) days to respond, meaning that USCIS's response to the Complaint is actually due on February 3, 2023. See (ECF No. 8). As such, because Defendant's response is due before the joint scheduling report deadline, there is no longer any need for an extension of time. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion 7 is DENIED. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 1/10/2023. (fpi) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar