Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-30 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9760320) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. FOIA Request from FGI to DOC dated July 12, 2022, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General of the United States, # 4 Summons to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 5 Summons the U.S. Department of Commerce)(Goeken, Richard) (Entered: 12/30/2022) |
2023-01-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsl) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-03 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-02-06 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-06 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/7/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-03-08 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/08/2023) |
2023-03-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 5 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 7, 2023, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/9/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-04-07 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/07/2023) |
2023-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by June 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/11/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-06-06 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 06/06/2023) |
2023-06-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by June 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/7/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/07/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by July 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/5/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 9 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Duffey on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE Substituting for attorney Derek S. Hammond (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: On July 5, 2023, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint status report including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by July 31, 2023. Min. Order of July 5, 2023. The parties never filed that joint status report. Thus, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file that joint status report by August 25, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/21/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-28 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Goeken, Richard) (Entered: 08/28/2023) |
2023-08-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by September 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/29/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/29/2023) |
2023-09-28 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-10-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by October 27, 2023, a further joint status report, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/3/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-27 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-11-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by November 28, 2023, a further joint status report, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/1/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2023-11-28 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2023-11-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by January 5, 2024, a further joint status report, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/30/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
2023-12-14 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 12/14/2023) |
2024-01-05 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
2024-01-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 01/08/2024. (lclla3) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/11/2024) |
2024-02-20 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2024) |
2024-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 21, 2024. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 02/21/2024. (lclla3) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
2024-02-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |