Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03851
Date Filed2022-12-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted a FOIA request for records concerning meetings of the Supply Chain Disruption Task Force. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9760370) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 FOIA Request from FGI to DOL dated July 12, 2022, # 2 Summons to the Attorney General of the United States, # 3 Summons to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Laborrtation, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goeken, Richard) (Entered: 12/30/2022)
2023-01-03Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zcb) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-02-023Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar