Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03855
Date Filed2022-12-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning Chairman Gensler's policy for forwarding emails sent to his personal account to the agency for records retention. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant2255
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-311COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9760463) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/31/2022)
2023-01-022NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2023)
2023-01-03Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmrl) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar