Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEVANS v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv03761
Date Filed2022-12-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffTIAYON KADELL EVANS
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-12-19Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/19/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-191COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY filed by TIAYON KADELL EVANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 FOIA Request to US Atty)(zcb) # 4 Exhibit) (zcb). (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2022-12-192MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TIAYON KADELL EVANS. (zcb) (Entered: 12/27/2022)
2023-01-04MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's motion 2 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall assign this case randomly to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/4/2023. (psu1) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-06Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar