Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00010
Date Filed2023-01-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionGun Owners of America and Gun Owners Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the FBI for records concerning the Intelligence in Depth report entitled Diverse DVE Landscape Probably Will Persist, dated December 30, 2020. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DHS told GOA that it did not have a copy of the record. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, GOA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-01-031COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9763875) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General, # 4 Summons to the DHS, # 5 Summons to the FBI, # 6 Memorandum in Support to the US Attorney)(Olson, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2023)
2023-01-04Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsl) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-01-043SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-02-234NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah Lee Morgan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2023. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/16/2023. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-03-207ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by April 4, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 4, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar