Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWilderness Watch v. United States Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityMissoula
Case Number9:2023cv00011
Date Filed2023-01-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dana L. Christensen
PlaintiffWilderness Watch
Case DescriptionWilderness Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning examples of grazing-related motorized use authorizations from the last ten years. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wilderness Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-01-181COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Land Management, filed by Wilderness Watch. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-18Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-3002987 (TAG) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-182Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (TAG) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-183Submission of Proposed Summons as to United States Bureau of Land Management, re 1 Complaint (Hursh, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-184Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Land Management and U.S. Attorney. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued) (SGN) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-185Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilderness Watch. (Hursh, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-01-316Proof of Service filed by Wilderness Watch. Service by Certified Mail on January 18, 2023. (Hursh, Andrew) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
2023-01-31Set Deadlines: United States Bureau of Land Management answer due 3/27/2023. (SGN) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
2023-02-237NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Newman on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management (Newman, John) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-238Unopposed MOTION to Continue Answer Deadline John M. Newman appearing for Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Newman, John) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-239ORDER granting 8 Motion to Continue. Defendant shall have until April 26, 2023, to respond to Plaintif's Complaint. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/23/2023. (ASG) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
2023-02-23Set Deadlines/Hearings: United States Bureau of Land Management answer due 4/26/2023. (ASG) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar