Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGEDDIS v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00191
Date Filed2023-01-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffRONALD GEDDIS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-01-23Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 01/23/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-01-231COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by RONALD GEDDIS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(zcb) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-01-232MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RONALD GEDDIS. (zcb) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-01-233PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by RONALD GEDDIS (zcb) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-03-014ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/01/2023. (zcb) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-065ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/06/2023. (DM) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-04-186AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by RONALD GEDDIS. (Attachment: # 1 Affidavit)(zjm) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-05-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to issue summonses for the United States Department of Homeland Security, the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, and the United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, see Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i), and to cause service to be effected by the United States Marshals Service, see 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/12/2023. (psu3) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-177Summons (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, Department of Homeland Security sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (zcb) (Entered: 05/17/2023)
2023-05-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/24/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/19/2023 (zjm) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar