Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00262
Date Filed2023-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Civil Rights Division for records concerning DOJ's efforts to monitor state elections. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-01-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9822467) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/30/2023)
2023-01-31Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
2023-01-312SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
2023-02-283RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/13/2023 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/3/2023) (ztth). (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/13/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/3/2023) (ztth). (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/13/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/3/2023) (ztth). (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-036NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Clendenen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-037Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Unopposed 7 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by April 5, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/3/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/5/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 03/06/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar