Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNomlaki Technologies, LLC v. United States Air Force
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2023cv00301
Date Filed2023-02-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge S. Kato Crews
PlaintiffNomlaki Technologies, LLC
Case DescriptionNomlaki Technologies submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Air Force for records concerning construction services provided by the company under a contract at Beale Air Force Base. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and disclosed redacted documents, although Nomlaki already had unredacted copies of some of them. Because the agency did not provide an explanation of its response, Nomlaki Technologies felt it had no base on which to craft an administrative appeal. Instead, Nomlaki Technologies filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Air Force
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-011COMPLAINT against United States Air Force (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8915609)Attorney David Matthew Frommell added to party Nomlaki Technologies, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Nomlaki Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frommell, David) (Entered: 02/01/2023)
2023-02-022SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Air Force re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Nomlaki Technologies, LLC. (Frommell, David) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-023NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott M. Shea on behalf of Nomlaki Technologies, LLCAttorney Scott M. Shea added to party Nomlaki Technologies, LLC(pty:pla) (Shea, Scott) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-024Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (tgall, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-025SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, ) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-026NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Kent Markham on behalf of Nomlaki Technologies, LLCAttorney Ryan Kent Markham added to party Nomlaki Technologies, LLC(pty:pla) (Markham, Ryan) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-037ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: 6 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan Kent Markham. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (csarr, ) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-03-108SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nomlaki Technologies, LLC. United States Air Force served on 3/9/2023, answer due 3/30/2023. (Gunnell, Bret) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-279NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brad E. Leneis on behalf of United States Air ForceAttorney Brad E. Leneis added to party United States Air Force(pty:dft) (Leneis, Brad) (Entered: 03/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar