Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9828040) filed by SANCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Dep't of Treasury)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-01 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SANCTIONS, INC. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-01 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-01 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-01 | 4 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/1/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-07 | 5 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SANCTIONS, INC. served on 2/6/2023 (Weismann, Anne) Modified on 2/8/2023 (zed). (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-07 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/6/23. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-07 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/8/2023. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-08 | | NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 5 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant. The following error(s) need correction: Select parties that have been served and enter date of delivery (not date mailed). Please refile. (zed) (Entered: 02/08/2023) |
2023-02-08 | 8 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/8/2023. (Weismann, Anne) Modified on 2/8/2023 as duplicate to Docket Entry 7 (zed). (Entered: 02/08/2023) |
2023-02-08 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 2/6/2023 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/08/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 11 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-02-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Government's 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The Government shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-03-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/22/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 12 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 13 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by June 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/22/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-03-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |