Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00290
Date Filed2023-02-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request for records concerning communications sent or received by Brandon Judd, a CPB agent and president of the National Border Patrol Council Union concerning his belief in the great replacement theory. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-011COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9830576) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Gutman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2023)
2023-02-02Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-03-023RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 2/14/2023 (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/6/2023) (ztth). (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/15/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/6/2023) (ztth). (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/17/2023. (Gutman, Jeffrey) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/6/2023) (ztth). (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-096ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 24, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/10/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/24/2023 (tj) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-227Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/22/2023)
2023-03-228ERRATA by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/22/2023)
2023-03-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/22/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar