Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT v. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00304
Date Filed2023-02-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffINTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT
Case DescriptionInternational Refugee Assistance Project submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Boarder Protection for records concerning the Biden administration's decision to re-institute the Remain in Mexico program. IRAP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told IRAQ that its request for expedited processing was denied and its request for a fee waiver was not applicable. After hearing nothing further from the agency, IRAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-021COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9834066) filed by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons for CBP, # 4 Summons Summons for US Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons for US Attorney)(Stanley, Brooke) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT (Stanley, Brooke) (Entered: 02/02/2023)
2023-02-03Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-084STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 8, 2023. (lcbah4) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar