Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-03 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9836125) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Agriculture, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (znmw) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/9/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/11/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/17/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 2/16/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brooke Paz)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by March 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 13, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-27 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/27/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |