Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union et al v. National Security Agency et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv00907
Date Filed2023-02-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis J. Liman
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted FOIA requests to the National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, the CIA, and the Department of Justice for records concerning FISA of FISCR opinions or orders dated on or after January 1, 2021 address novel or significant issues, including but not limited to novel or significant issues concerning Section 702 surveillance. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Security Agency
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantDepartment Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-031COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27291100)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-032CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-033RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-034REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-035REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-036REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-037REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-06CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-06Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-06Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-068ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency. (vf) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-069ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (vf) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-0610ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (vf) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-0611ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (vf) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-0712FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabriella Larios on behalf of New York Civil Liberties Union..(Larios, Gabriella) Modified on 2/7/2023 (lb). (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-0713FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY -(WRONG ATTORNEY LOGIN) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabriella Larios on behalf of New York Civil Liberties Union..(Larios, Gabriella) Modified on 2/7/2023 (lb). (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-0714FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Perry Grossman on behalf of New York Civil Liberties Union..(Grossman, Perry) Modified on 2/7/2023 (lb). (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-07***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Perry Grossman and Gabriella Larios. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: New York Civil Liberties Union. The party was added to the case in error. (lb) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-0715NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gabriella Larios on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Larios, Gabriella) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-0716NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Perry Grossman on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Grossman, Perry) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-0917NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Taitz on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Taitz, Sarah) (Entered: 02/09/2023)
2023-02-1418NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 21, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. And as set forth herein. Counsel for Plaintiffs is ordered to notify Defendants of this Notice. SO ORDERED. Telephonic Initial Conference set for 3/21/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/14/2023) (ama) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-2819SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. National Security Agency served on 2/10/2023, answer due 3/3/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-2820SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Central Intelligence Agency served on 2/13/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-2821SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Department Of Justice served on 2/13/2023, answer due 3/6/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-2822SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 2/14/2023, answer due 3/7/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation; American Civil Liberties Union..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-2823SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-2824SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-1425JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sarah Taitz dated 03/14/2023. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 03/14/2023)
2023-03-1626ORDER granting 25 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sarah Taitz dated 03/14/2023. Parties are to provide a further status report to the Court in 30 days, on April 13, 2023, and governments time to answer is extended through the same date. The Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for March 21, 2023 is CANCELED. All other relief regarding the case management plan and scheduling is granted as proposed. (All Defendants answer due 4/13/2023.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf) (Entered: 03/16/2023)
2023-03-1727NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Max Aronoff on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Department Of Justice, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 03/17/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar