Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00327
Date Filed2023-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the total number of hours validated in WebTA by FBI Special agents assigned to the Washington Field Office from May 31, 2020 to August 31, 2020. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9841079) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-07Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-03-083Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/08/2023)
2023-03-10MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before March 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/10/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-224ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/22/2023)
2023-03-245ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 5, 2023. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/24/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar