Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00330
Date Filed2023-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning FBI whistleblower information provided to House Judiciary Committee Republicans suggesting that the FBI and Facebook have a special relationship that may threaten constitutional protections. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Heritage Foundation that the language of the request did not allow for a search. The Heritage Foundation filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9841313) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-07Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsl) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-093STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 9, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 02/09/2023)
2023-02-284NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-095ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-15MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 5, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated dates for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's request can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 15, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar