Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Food & Drug Administration
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv00976
Date Filed2023-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mary Kay Vyskocil
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffChris Hamby
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Chris Hamby submitted two FOIA requests to the FDA for records concerning the agency's database for Class II and Class III medical devices. The Times also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency denied the Times' request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Food & Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-061COMPLAINT against United States Food & Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27302596)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Chris Hamby..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-062CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-063REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Food & Drug Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Chris Hamby, The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-064RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
2023-02-07CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-07Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-07Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-075ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Food & Drug Administration. (vf) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-03-156NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Ellen Brennan on behalf of United States Food & Drug Administration..(Brennan, Mary) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
2023-03-157ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Food & Drug Administration..(Brennan, Mary) (Entered: 03/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar