Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWhatley et al v. North Charleston, City of et al
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2023cv00516
Date Filed2023-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Sherri A Lydon
PlaintiffReverend Dr. Samuel T. Whatley
PlaintiffSamuel T Whatley, II
Case DescriptionSamuel Whatley submitted access requests to the City of North Charleston. This is not FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantNorth Charleston, City of
DefendantNorth Charleston Police Department
DefendantNorth Charleston Code Enforcement
DefendantNorth Charleston Municipal Court, City of
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-061COMPLAINT against North Charleston Code Enforcement, North Charleston Municipal Court, City of, North Charleston Police Department, North Charleston, City of, filed by Samuel T. Whatley, Samuel T Whatley, II. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Envelope)(dist) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-073MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Samuel T Whatley, II. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(dist) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-075TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (dist) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-158PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 3/8/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 2/15/2023. (dist) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-159Clerk's Notice: 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in 8 . (dist) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-1510***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Proper Form Order, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, blank summons, AO-240 form, blank 26.01 form placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Samuel T. Whatley, Samuel T Whatley II, 579 Folly Road, Unit 14254, Charleston, SC 29422. (dist) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-03-0111Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Samuel T Whatley, II. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(dist) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-0212MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Samuel T. Whatley. Response to Motion due by 3/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(dist) (Entered: 03/02/2023)
2023-03-0916ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case be summarily dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 3/23/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 3/8/2023. (dist) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-0917Clerk's Notice: 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed in 16 . (dist) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-0918***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Sherri A Lydon. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 901 Richland Street, Columbia, SC 29201. (dist) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-0919***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 18 Transfer of Case Management, 17 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Samuel T. Whatley 579 Folly Road Unit 14254 Charleston, SC 29422. (dist) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-1720OBJECTION to 16 Report and Recommendation by Samuel T. Whatley, Samuel T Whatley, II. Reply to Objections due by 3/31/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ahil) (Entered: 03/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar