Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management, The
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2023cv00350
Date Filed2023-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Nina Y. Wang
PlaintiffFriends of Animals a 501(c)(3) organization
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted four FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a variety of issues. FOA also requested a fee waiver for each request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency concerning its requests, FOA filed a pattern or practice claim against the agency.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management, The a federal agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-071COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8925909)Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BLM National Office, # 3 Summons US Attorney Colorado, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Huss, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-072Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-073SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-084MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00350-NYW. (athom, ) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
2023-02-085ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/8/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
2023-03-106NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brad E. Leneis on behalf of United States Bureau of Land Management, TheAttorney Brad E. Leneis added to party United States Bureau of Land Management, The(pty:dft) (Leneis, Brad) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-107Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint, by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management, The. (Leneis, Brad) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-108MEMORANDUM regarding 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint, filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/10/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-139MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/13/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion 7 is GRANTED. Defendant has up to and including March 24, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.(alave, ) (Entered: 03/13/2023)
2023-03-2410Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management, The. (Leneis, Brad) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar