Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00340
Date Filed2023-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning communications between Commissioner Charles Rettig and a number of identified individuals, including Sam Bankman-Fried. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told PPT the request was too broad for a search. PPT told the IRS that it believed the request was not too broad. The agency then closed the request for failure to provide information that would enable a search. PPT believed it had exhausted its administrative and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-071COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9842907) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Interim Response Letter, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Response to Interim Response Letter, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Jan. 12 Letter, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Jan. 13 Letter, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - IRS Final Response, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Summons - US Attorney's Office, # 9 Summons Summons - US Attorney General, # 10 Summons Summons - IRS Chief Counsel)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-07Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsl) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-072SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-03-093ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Bruce, Elisabeth) (Entered: 03/09/2023)
2023-03-104ORDER: Local Rule 16.3(b)(10) exempts parties to a FOIA action from typical scheduling order requirements. Instead, the government has the burden to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting dispositive motion. The Court therefore ORDERS the government to file the index and supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/10/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar