Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00342
Date Filed2023-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning an incident in June 2020 when FBI agents allegedly knelt in solidarity with Black Lives Matters protesters. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Heritage Foundation that it found no responsive records. The Heritage Foundation filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9845599) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
2023-02-08Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
2023-02-082SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
2023-02-083ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/08/23. (DM) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
2023-03-104NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-105ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-106ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before April 7, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 10, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/10/2023)
2023-03-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2023. (dot) (Entered: 03/12/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar