Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKNIGHT, LLP v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00361
Date Filed2023-02-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffHOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Holland & Knight submitted a FOIA request to Amtrak for records concerning the March 22, 2022 Amtrak Board of Directors resolution entitled Board of Directors Resolution Authorizing the Acquisition of Certain Leasehold interests in Washington Union Station. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Holland & Knight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-081COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9848520) filed by HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Summons)(Kiernan, Paul) (Entered: 02/08/2023)
2023-02-09Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcb) (Entered: 02/09/2023)
2023-02-092SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/09/2023)
2023-02-213RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) served on 2/14/2023, answer due 3/7/2023 (Kiernan, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2023)
2023-03-064MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay or, in the Alternative, for an MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Lindsay C. Harrison, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Harrison, Lindsay). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 3/10/2023 (zed). Added MOTION to Stay on 3/13/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 03/06/2023)
2023-03-215RESPONSE re 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to MOTION to Stay filed by HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP.. (Kiernan, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
2023-03-236Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to MOTION to Stay by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lindsay) (Entered: 03/23/2023)
2023-03-24MINUTE ORDER granting Amtrak's 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of 4 Motion to Consolidate and Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint. Amtrak's Reply brief shall now be due on or before April 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/24/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar