Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv00372
Date Filed2023-02-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning certain email correspondence between Secretary Janet Yellin, Climate Counselor John Morton, and Chief of Staff Didem Niscanci. EPA also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-02-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-9850322) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 02/09/2023)
2023-02-10Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zrtw) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-02-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 02/10/2023)
2023-03-033NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/03/2023)
2023-03-074Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/07/2023)
2023-03-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 4 Defendant's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the 4 Defendant's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before April 3, 2023, the defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 27, 2023. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar